Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Midwest Juice Inc Of Michigan, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Mission Point Of Warren Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2024 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY SAWYER THOMAS ROZGOWSKI (Attorney) on behalf of MIDWEST JUICE INC OF MICHIGAN (PLAINTIFF) | ||
March 27, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1359972 Date: 03/27/2024 | ||
March 27, 2024 | APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY KENNETH ROBERT BEAMS (Attorney) on behalf of MISSION POINT OF BEVERLY HILLS LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLARKSTON LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLAWSON LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLINTON TOWNSHIP LLC, MISSION POINT OF FLINT LLC, MISSION POINT OF MADISON HEIGHTS LLC, MISSION POINT OF SUPERIOR WOODS LLC, MISSION POINT OF WARREN LLC (DEFENDANT) | ||
March 27, 2024 | DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION, BRIEF IN SUPPORT KENNETH ROBERT BEAMS (Attorney) on behalf of MISSION POINT OF BEVERLY HILLS LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLARKSTON LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLAWSON LLC, MISSION POINT OF CLINTON TOWNSHIP LLC, MISSION POINT OF FLINT LLC, MISSION POINT OF MADISON HEIGHTS LLC, MISSION POINT OF SUPERIOR WOODS LLC, MISSION POINT OF WARREN LLC (DEFENDANT) | ||
February 22, 2024 | FILING FEES FOR NEW CASE Receipt: 1354608 Date: 02/22/2024 | ||
February 22, 2024 | SUMMONS ISSUED MISSION POINT OF BEVERLY HILLS LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF CLARKSTON LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF CLAWSON LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF CLINTON TOWNSHIP LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF FLINT LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF MADISON HEIGHTS LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF SUPERIOR WOODS LLC (DEFENDANT); MISSION POINT OF WARREN LLC (DEFENDANT); | ||
February 22, 2024 | ELECTRONIC FILING FEE Receipt: 1354608 Date: 02/22/2024 | ||
February 22, 2024 | COMPLAINT (8 PGS & 25 PGS EXHIBITS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.