Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Brooks, Steven M, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Acrisure Llc, Acrisure Of California Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | POS OF DEFS' RESPONSE TO PLA'S AMENDED OFFER OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 20, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S INITIAL DISLCOSURES PURSUANT TO MCR 2.302(A) | ||
March 06, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S AMENDED OFFER OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDENTS | ||
March 06, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDENTS | ||
March 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO MCR 2.116(C)(8) ON (4/24/24 @ 9 AM) EDWARD J. BARDELLI (Attorney) on behalf of ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, ACRISURE LLC (DEFENDANT) | ||
March 05, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1356623 Date: 03/05/2024 | ||
March 05, 2024 | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION Date: 04/24/2024 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ACKERT, HONORABLE TJ Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #10A | ||
March 05, 2024 | DEFS. ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AND ACRISURE, LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO MCR 2.116(C)(8), BRIEF EDWARD J. BARDELLI (Attorney) on behalf of ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, ACRISURE LLC (DEFENDANT) | ||
March 05, 2024 | DEFS' ANSWER TO PLA'S COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES EDWARD J. BARDELLI (Attorney) on behalf of ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, ACRISURE LLC (DEFENDANT) | ||
March 04, 2024 | APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW EDWARD SIERAWSKI (Attorney) on behalf of ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, ACRISURE LLC (DEFENDANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.