Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jarrard, Susan M, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
CategoryNo-Fault Automobile Insurance |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 05/08/2024 Time: 10:00 am Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 | ||
March 22, 2024 | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (5/8/24 @ 10 AM VIA ZOOM) & POS | ||
March 13, 2024 | PLA'S ANSWER TO DEF USAA'S SPECIAL AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND POS DAVID M. GIVSKUD (Attorney) on behalf of SUSAN M JARRARD (PLAINTIFF) | ||
March 13, 2024 | DEF USAA'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, SPECIAL AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, RELIANCE UPON JURY DEMAND AND POS PATRICK K. MCGLINN (Attorney) on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT) | ||
March 13, 2024 | APPEARANCE AND POS PATRICK K. MCGLINN (Attorney) on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT) | ||
February 22, 2024 | SUMMONS RETURNED (SERVED TO R.A. BY CM 2/16/24) USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); | ||
February 09, 2024 | PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (4 PGS) | ||
February 09, 2024 | ELECTRONIC FILING FEE Receipt: 1352804 Date: 02/09/2024 | ||
February 09, 2024 | SUMMONS ISSUED USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); | ||
February 09, 2024 | JURY DEMAND Receipt: 1352804 Date: 02/09/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.