Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Fidelity Leasing Group Iii Llc, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Comstock Nails Llc, Le, Cindy, Luu, David, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2024 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | CANCELLED The following event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: CANCELLED Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS PRIOR TO HEARING - PJM | ||
March 13, 2024 | DEFAULT REQUEST, ENTRY AND JUDGMENT (SUM CERTAIN) IN FAVOR OF PLA, IN THE AMOUNT OF $215,453.44 | ||
March 12, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S DEFAULT REQUEST, ENTRY AND JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $215453.44 | ||
March 12, 2024 | DEFAULT REQUEST, ENTRY AND JUDGMENT (SUM CERTAIN) IN FAVOR OF PLA, IN THE AMOUNT OF $215,453.44 | ||
March 12, 2024 | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFAULT REQUEST, ENTRY, AND JUDGMENT (SUM CERTAIN) | ||
March 04, 2024 | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION Date: 04/11/2024 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: BENSON, HONORABLE CURT A Location: ZOOM MEETING ID 805 996 3007, PASSWORD 555552 Result: CANCELLED | ||
March 04, 2024 | APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY EFSTATHIOS T. KIOUSIS (Attorney) on behalf of FIDELITY LEASING GROUP III LLC (PLAINTIFF) | ||
March 04, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1356431 Date: 03/04/2024 | ||
March 04, 2024 | SUMMONS RETURNED (SERVED 2/14/24) COMSTOCK NAILS LLC (DEFENDANT); | ||
March 04, 2024 | SUMMONS RETURNED (SERVED 2/14/24) DAVID LUU (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.