Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Rezplot Systems Llc, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Arcello, Colleen S, Arcello, Francis, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2024 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | POS OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; PLA'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PLA REZPLOT SYSTEMS LLC'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; ORDER GRANTING PLA'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE; POS DATED 3/29/24; AND CORRECTED POS DATED 4/1/24 | ||
April 01, 2024 | [CORRECTED] POS OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; PLA'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PLA REZPLOT SYSTEMS, LLC'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; ORDER GRANTING PLA'S VERIFIED EXPARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE, POS DATED 3/29/24; & POS | ||
April 01, 2024 | POS OF WILLIAM HAKE'S EXPERT OPINION REPORT | ||
April 01, 2024 | POS OF ORDER GRANTING PLA'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE & POS | ||
March 29, 2024 | POS OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLLEN S. ARCELLO; PLA'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PLA'S REZPLOT SYSTEMS, LCC'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTOIN FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; ORDER GRANTING PLA'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE & POS | ||
March 28, 2024 | ORDER GRANTING PLA'S VERIFIED EXPARTE MOTION FOR FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE (FIRST CLASS MAIL AND UPS PRIORITY MAIL W/DELIVERY CONFIRMATION) | ||
March 27, 2024 | PLA REZPLOT SYSTEMS LLC'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF COLLEEN S ARCELLO SHELBY JO MARTINIE (Attorney) on behalf of REZPLOT SYSTEMS LLC (PLAINTIFF) | ||
March 27, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1359973 Date: 03/27/2024 | ||
March 27, 2024 | POS OF PLA REZPLOT SYSTEMS, LLC'S VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF COLLEEN S. ARCELL & POS | ||
March 11, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ISSUED SUMMONS TO COLLEEN S. ARCELLO; PLA'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES; PLA REZPLOT SYSTEMS, LLC D/B/A CAMPSPOT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF FRANCIS ARCELLO & POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.