Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Dfcu Financial, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Kiogima, Scott Allan, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | BANKRUPTCY NOTIFICATION (ISSUE NO GARNISHMENTS OR EXECUTIONS) | ||
April 22, 2024 | SUMMONS RETURNED (SERVED BY TACKING/AFFIXING 4/10/24) (UNPERFECTED SERVICE: NO CM RETURN RECIPT) | ||
April 04, 2024 | SUMMONS RETURNED (SERVED BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL 4/2/24) (CERTIFIED MAIL: NO RETURN RECEIPT) | ||
March 29, 2024 | ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE (FIRST CLASS MAIL, TACKING OR AFFIXING AND CERTIFIED MAIL - RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED) | ||
March 28, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1360110 Date: 03/28/2024 | ||
March 21, 2024 | SECOND SUMMONS ISSUED SCOTT ALLAN KIOGIMA (DEFENDANT); | ||
March 21, 2024 | MOTION FOR SECOND SUMMONS AND ORDER (GRANTED AND EXP. 6/19/24) | ||
March 20, 2024 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1358992 Date: 03/20/2024 | ||
January 08, 2024 | COMPLAINT FOR DEBT OWING AND POSSESSION OF PROPERTY (3 PGS & 4 PGS ATTACHMENT) | ||
January 08, 2024 | SUMMONS ISSUED SCOTT ALLAN KIOGIMA (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.