Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Jude'S Barbershop Inc, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Merrifield, Kalyn, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | POS OF DEF/COUNTER-PLA, KALYN MERRIFIELD'S MEDIATION SUMMARY | ||
April 16, 2024 | POS OF DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO JUDE'S BARBERSHOP, INC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO KALYN MERRIFIELD; DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO KALYN MERRIFIELD; | ||
April 05, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S RESPONSE TO DEFS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE | ||
April 04, 2024 | COUNTER-DEF'S RESPONSES TO DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF AND POS ROBERT MELVIN HARDING (Attorney) on behalf of JUDE'S BARBERSHOP INC (PLAINTIFF) | ||
April 02, 2024 | POS OF DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF | ||
April 02, 2024 | DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S RESPONSE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS JONATHAN DAVID TROMP (Attorney) on behalf of KALYN MERRIFIELD (DEFENDANT) | ||
April 01, 2024 | POS OF PLA'S ANSWERS TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLA | ||
March 08, 2024 | POS OF DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF AND DEF/COUNTER-PLA'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLA/COUNTER-DEF | ||
March 07, 2024 | PLA/COUNTER DEF'S AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ROBERT MELVIN HARDING (Attorney) on behalf of JUDE'S BARBERSHOP INC (PLAINTIFF) | ||
March 05, 2024 | POS OF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.