Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Traffic: Adult case against Hill, Cody Alan, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Foster, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
|
Arraignment
Date: November 09, 2020Arraignment
Date: February 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment Judge: Foster, David |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case to Proceed to Collections | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment Judge: Foster, David |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DD5 - Failure to Appear - FTA | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Revised FTA - 2nd Notice Civil Assessment added for FTA |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Revised FTA Courtesy Notice FTA - 10 Day Collection Notice |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Revised A/J Traffic Courtesy Notice MA Courtesy Notice - Traffic |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.