Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Newhouse, Stephanie, filed a(n) Agencies case against Michigan Department Of Civil Rights, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryAgencies |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT - RECORD RECEIVED AT THE MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHTS | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF RECORD FROM CIRCUIT COURT & POS (RECORD RETURNED TO MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHTS VIA CERT MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED) | |
April 05, 2023 | CASE CLOSED | ||
April 03, 2023 | ORDER/OPINION RE: APPEAL OF MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHT'S DECISION (AFFIRMED), POS | ||
February 17, 2023 | BRIEF OF MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND POS TONYA CELESTE JETER (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHTS (DEFENDANT) | ||
January 31, 2023 | PLAINTIFF-APPELLANT'S BRIEF ON APPEAL AND POS GARRETT J. TENHAVE-CHAPMAN (Attorney) on behalf of STEPHANIE NEWHOUSE (PLAINTIFF) | ||
January 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS APPEAL (UNLESS REQUIRED DOCUMENTS ARE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS) AND POS | ||
January 13, 2023 | APPEARANCE TONYA CELESTE JETER (Attorney) on behalf of MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CIVIL RIGHTS (DEFENDANT) | ||
December 12, 2022 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF RECORD FILED IN CIRCUIT COURT AND POS | ||
December 09, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF RECORDS TRANSMITTED FOR APPEAL AND NOTICE TO PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.