Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Glupker, Chadd, Glupker, Sarah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Meijer Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury, Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT (HELD/NOT SETTLED) PARTIES DID NOT SETTLE: FURTHER ADR NOT CONTEMPLATED | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION DENIED The following event: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: MOTION DENIED Judge: MCNABB, HONORABLE DEBORAH L Location: REMOTE HEARING VIA ZOOM HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: GIBSON, LISA Certificate #: 9604 COURT REPORTER: FTR 7D Certificate #: | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER DISPENSING WITH ORAL ARGUMENT AND DENYING PLA'S MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE AND POS | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | POS OF DEF'S RESPONSE TO PLAS' MOTOIN FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF'S RESPONSE TO PLA'S MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE DANIEL J. JAMES (Attorney) on behalf of MEIJER INC (DEFENDANT) | |
January 02, 2024 | SCHEDULED Event: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE Date: 01/19/2024 Time: 8:30 am Judge: MCNABB, HONORABLE DEBORAH L Location: REMOTE HEARING VIA ZOOM Result: MOTION DENIED | ||
December 29, 2023 | RENOTICE OF HEARING FOR (PLA'S MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE) (1/19/24 @ 8:30 AM) VIA ZOOM & POS | ||
December 27, 2023 | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 1346399 Date: 12/27/2023 | ||
December 27, 2023 | PLAS' MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE, NOTICE OF HEARING (1/19/24 AT 8:30 AM), BRIEF & POS CHRISTOPHER SHEA BERRY (Attorney) on behalf of SARAH GLUPKER, CHADD GLUPKER (PLAINTIFF) | ||
December 13, 2023 | HELD VIA ZOOM The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD VIA ZOOM Judge: ELMORE, HONORABLE CHRISTINA Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 665 859 4577 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 10C Certificate #: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.