Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Fisk, Heather, Fisk, Timothy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Mcm Mi Riverview Llc, Sparta Riverview, Vista Communities Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts with Edward J. Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
CategoryHousing And Real Estate |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE EVALUATION NOTICE (6/18/24 @ 9:30 AM) VIA ZOOM & POS | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE EVALUATION HEARING ADJOURNED The following event: CASE EVALUATION HEARING scheduled for 02/15/2024 at 10:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: CASE EVALUATION HEARING ADJOURNED Judge: ZPANEL, FEB 15, 2024 Location: | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT (NOT HELD) OTHER: SEE ATTACHED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER TO ADJOURN CASE EVALUATION (ADJOURNED AT LEAST 60 DAYS) | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE EVALUATION NOTICE (2/15/24 @ 10 AM VIA ZOOM) & POS | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | HELD - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT The following event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 1:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT Judge: ROSSI, HONORABLE J JOSEPH Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 659 286 4395 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 9D Certificate #: | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION OF MCM MI RIVERVIEW LLC AND MCM MI (CHATTEL) LLC FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO MCR 2.116(8) AND (10), POS LAWRENCE P. SWISTAK (Attorney) on behalf of MCM MI RIVERVIEW LLC, MCM MI CHATTEL LLC (DEFENDANT) | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION Date: 10/13/2023 Time: 1:00 pm Judge: ROSSI, HONORABLE J JOSEPH Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 659 286 4395 Result: HELD - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MCM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION AND POS (CIVIL BOX 693) KATIE MARIE JOHNSON (Attorney) on behalf of HEATHER FISK, TIMOTHY FISK (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | HELD - DENIED W/O PREJUDICE The following event: MOTION TO AMEND scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 11:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD - DENIED W/O PREJUDICE Judge: ROSSI, HONORABLE J JOSEPH Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 659 286 4395 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 9D Certificate #: L BAIRD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.