Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Bainbridge, Johanna, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case against Minor, Jason, Morehouse, Richard, Morehouse, Scott, Morehouse Squared Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts with Edward J. Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward J. Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryEmployment Discrimination |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS W/PREJUDICE | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE SETTLED AND FINAL DOCUMENTS WILL BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 9:45 am has been resulted as follows: Result: CASE SETTLED AND FINAL DOCUMENTS WILL BE FILED Judge: ROSSI, HONORABLE J JOSEPH Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 659 286 4395 | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) (01/07/22 @ 09:45 AM VIA ZOOM), POS | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 01/07/2022 Time: 9:45 am Judge: ROSSI, HONORABLE J JOSEPH Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 659 286 4395 Result: CASE SETTLED AND FINAL DOCUMENTS WILL BE FILED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND RELIANCE ON JURY DEMAND, POS COURTNEY L. NICHOLS (Attorney) on behalf of MOREHOUSE SQUARED LLC, SCOTT MOREHOUSE, RICHARD MOREHOUSE, JASON MINOR (DEFENDANT) | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, POS COURTNEY L. NICHOLS (Attorney) on behalf of MOREHOUSE SQUARED LLC, SCOTT MOREHOUSE, RICHARD MOREHOUSE, JASON MINOR (DEFENDANT) | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY ATTORNEY COURTNEY NICHOLS (SERVED ON 9/24/21) MOREHOUSE SQUARED LLC (DEFENDANT); | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY ATTORNEY COURTNEY NICHOLS (SERVED ON 9/24/21) SCOTT MOREHOUSE (DEFENDANT); | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY ATTORNEY COURTNEY NICHOLS (SERVED ON 9/24/21) JASON MINOR (DEFENDANT); | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY ATTORNEY COURTNEY NICHOLS (SERVED ON 9/24/21) RICHARD MOREHOUSE (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.