Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Cazier, Kevin, Czier, Tanna L, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Patrick, Blake M, Patrick, Pauline C, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | ||
July 07, 2021 | STIPULATION & ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS UNTIL THE BANKRUPCY COURT CAN APPROVE SETTLEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION (NOT TO EXCEED 60 DAYS) | ||
June 24, 2021 | CASE EVALUATION'S NOTICE OF THE PARTIES RE: ACCEPTANCE OF EVALUATION AWARD, POS | ||
June 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF CASE EVALUATION (ACCEPT), POS LORYN ELIZABETH SCHLINKER (Attorney) on behalf of TANNA L CZIER, KEVIN CAZIER (PLAINTIFF) | ||
June 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF CASE EVALUATION (ACCEPT), POS STUART L. WEESNER (Attorney) on behalf of BLAKE M PATRICK, PAULINE C PATRICK (DEFENDANT) | ||
May 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF CASE EVALUATION, POS | ||
May 27, 2021 | HELD VIA ZOOM The following event: CASE EVALUATION HEARING scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 11:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD VIA ZOOM Judge: ZPANEL, MAY 27, 2021 Location: | ||
May 04, 2021 | STIPULATION & ORDER TO AMEND CASE CAPTION TO READ "TANNA CAZIER, KEVIN CAZIER AND JEFF A. MOYER BANKRUPTYCY TRUSTEE AS INTERVENING PLAINTIFF V. BLAKE M. PATRICK AND PAULINE C. PATRICK | ||
April 15, 2021 | NOTICE TO APPEAR (CASE EVALUATION 5/27/21 AT 11 AM VIA ZOOM), POS | ||
January 05, 2021 | PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED TRIAL WITNESS LIST, POS LORYN ELIZABETH SCHLINKER (Attorney) on behalf of TANNA L CZIER, KEVIN CAZIER (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.