Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Honey Creek Inn Inc, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Citizens Insurance Company Of America, Hanover Insurance Group, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO HON. CURT A. BENSON SUCCESSOR TO HON. CHRISTOPHER P. YATES'S BUSINESS DOCKET | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HELD - CLAIRE MERINO, CER 9475 The following event: MOTION IN LIMINE scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 2:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 338 001 2614 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 11A Certificate #: | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HELD/SETTLEMENT PLACED ON RECORD - MOLLY NORTON, CER 8741 The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 2:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD/SETTLEMENT PLACED ON RECORD Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 338 001 2614 HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: ZOOM Certificate #: | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED DUE TO SETTLEMENT The following event: JURY TRIAL - CIVIL scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 8:30 am, 11/03/2021 at 8:30 am, 11/04/2021 at 8:30 am, 11/05/2021 at 1:30 pm, 11/08/2021 at 8:30 am, 11/09/2021 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO SETTLEMENT Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11A | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED DUE TO SETTLEMENT The following event: MOTION IN LIMINE scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO SETTLEMENT Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 338 001 2614 | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (TERMS OF SETTLEMENT WERE PLACED ON RECORD AND CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED AS TO ALL PARTIES) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENTS AS TO REPLACEMENT COST VALUE AND INCREASED COST OF CONSTRUCTION NICHOLAS S. LAUE (Attorney) on behalf of HONEY CREEK INN INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF HEARING (REGARDING DEF CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, AND ARGUMENTS AS TO REPLACEMENT COST VALUE AND INCREASED COST OF CONSTRUCTION) ON 10/12/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM AND POS NICOLE E. WILINSKI (Attorney) on behalf of CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (DEFENDANT) | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION IN LIMINE Date: 10/12/2021 Time: 2:00 pm Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: ZOOM MEETING ID # 338 001 2614 Result: HELD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.