Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Pieniazek, Larry, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Citizens Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2017 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO HON. CHRISTINA ELMORE SUCCESSOR TO HON. PAUL J. SULLIVAN | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLNF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 07/12/2017 at 4:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: NOT HELD - ORDER TO FOLLOW Judge: SULLIVAN, HONORABLE PAUL Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #10C | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | HELD - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT The following event: MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION scheduled for 06/16/2017 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD Judge: SULLIVAN, HONORABLE PAUL Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #10C HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: POST, GINNY Certificate #: CER-1489 | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY DISPOSITION PRUSUANT TO MCR 2.116(C)(10) JOE SADLER (Attorney) on behalf of LARRY PIENIAZEK (PLAINTIFF) | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION UNDER MCR 2.116(C)(10), POS NICOLE E. WILINSKI (Attorney) on behalf of CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT) | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | OPINION & ORDER DENYING DEF'S MOTION TO ADJOURN HEARING DATE AND RESPONSE DEADLINE FOR PL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION MOTION FILED | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | HELD The following event: MOTION TO ADJOURN scheduled for 06/02/2017 at 1:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD - Motion taken under advisement. Written opinion will be issued. Judge: SULLIVAN, HONORABLE PAUL Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #10C HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: POST, GINNY Certificate #: CER-1489 | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION TO ADJOURN Date: 06/02/2017 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SULLIVAN, HONORABLE PAUL Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #10C Result: HELD | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO ADJOURN HEARING DATE AND RESPONSE DEADLINE FOR PLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION, POS JOE SADLER (Attorney) on behalf of LARRY PIENIAZEK (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.