Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Greatland Corporation, filed a(n) Business Claims case against Capital Mailing Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2016 |
CategoryBusiness Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO HON. CURT A. BENSON SUCCESSOR TO HON. CHRISTOPHER P. YATES'S BUSINESS DOCKET | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (FOR PL AND AGAINST DEF IN THE AMOUNT OF $51,002.30) | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST, ENTRY & AFFIDAVIT CAPITAL MAILING SERVICES INC (DEFENDANT); | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (TACKING 4/30/16) CAPITAL MAILING SERVICES INC (DEFENDANT); | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (1ST CLASS MAIL 4/27/16) CAPITAL MAILING SERVICES INC (DEFENDANT); | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING ALTERNATE SERVICE FILED (1ST CLASS MAIL/TACKING) | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 850303 Date: 04/25/2016 | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION AND VERIFICATION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE EMILY SUZANNE RUCKER (Attorney) on behalf of GREATLAND CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CAPITAL MAILING SERVICES INC (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.