Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Wayer, Amy, Wayer, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2015 |
CategoryHousing And Real Estate |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | POS (CONFIRMING ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE SALE AND REPORT OF SALE OF THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1852 GERDA STREET SE KENTWOOD MICHIGAN) | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING FORECLOSURE SALE AND REPORT OF SALE FILED | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | POS (ORDER GRANTING PL'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR THE REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE DOCUMENTS AND AN ORDER GRANTING PL'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR RECOVERY OF AMOUNTS DUE UNDER PROMISSORY NOTE AND TO FORECLOSE ON MORTGAGE AND ORDER PROPERTY TO BE SOLD AT MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE) | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED STACY DILWORTH CER 8188 The following event: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT scheduled for 08/21/2015 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: MOTION GRANTED Judge: QUIST, HONORABLE GEORGE JAY Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #9B HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: JAVS 9B Certificate #: | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PL'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR THE REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE DOCUMENTS FILED | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PL'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR RECOVERY OF AMOUNTS DUE UNDER PROMISSORY NOTE AND TO FORECLOSE ON MORTGAGE AND ORDERING PROPERTY TO BE SOLD AT MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED (DOES NOT CLOSE CASE) | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 794873 Date: 08/13/2015 | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED Event: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT Date: 08/21/2015 Time: 9:00 am Judge: QUIST, HONORABLE GEORGE JAY Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #9B Result: MOTION GRANTED | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR THE REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE DOCUMENTS, RECOVERY OF AMOUNTS DUE UNDER PROMISSORY NOTE AND TO FORECLOSE ON MORTGAGE, AND ORDERING PROPERTY TO BE SOLD AT MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE, NOTICE, BRIEF & POS (08/21/15 @ 9:00) MARY K ATALLAH (Attorney) on behalf of HSBC BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.