Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tuttle, Amanda, Tuttle, James, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Hillman Md, Neal, Hooker Md, Robert L, Sherman Md, Helayne, Spectrum Heal Hospitals, Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | POS (STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL) | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL (W/PREJUDICE AND W/OUT COSTS) | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CANCELLED - PL'S COUNSEL CALLED AND LEFT MESSAGE THAT CASE HAS SETTLED AND STIP TO DISMISS IS IN PROCESS. The following event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for 04/22/2015 at 3:45 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: CANCELLED Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT, COURTROOM #11B | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | POS (PLS' FACILITATION SUMMARY) | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (NOTICE & PROOF) Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 04/22/2015 Time: 3:45 pm Judge: TRUSOCK, HONORABLE MARK A Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT, COURTROOM #11B Result: CANCELLED | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (03/10/15) HELAYNE SHERMAN MD (DEFENDANT); WEST MICHIGAN HEART PC (DEFENDANT); | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE MARK E. FATUM (Attorney) on behalf of ROBERT L HOOKER MD, WEST MICHIGAN CARDIOTHORACIC SURGEONS PLC (DEFENDANT) | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, RELIANCE UPON JURY DEMAND, POS ALBERT J. ENGEL III (Attorney) on behalf of HELAYNE SHERMAN MD, WEST MICHIGAN HEART PC (DEFENDANT) | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWERS TO DEFS NEIL HILLMAN AND SPECTRUM HEALTH'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, POS STEPHEN B. GOETHEL (Attorney) on behalf of AMANDA TUTTLE, JAMES TUTTLE (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (02/24/15) (SERVED ON ATTY) SPECTRUM HEALTH SYSTEM (DEFENDANT); SPECTRUM HEAL HOSPITALS, FREDERIK MEIJER HEART AND VASCULAR INSTITUTE; FRED AND LENA MEIJER HEART CENTER; MEIJER HEART CENTER; SPECTRUM HEALTH BUTTERWORTH CAMPUS (DEFENDANT); SPECTRUM HEALTH PRIMARY CARE PARTNERS, SPECTRUM HEALTH MEDICAL GROUP (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.