Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Leonard And Monroe Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Splurge Salon And Spa Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2014 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO HON. CURT A. BENSON SUCCESSOR TO HON. CHRISTOPHER P. YATES'S BUSINESS DOCKET | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED (PL AWARDED DAMAGES OF $39,603.00 AND COSTS OF $150.00) | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (FOR PL AND AGAINST DEF IN THE AMOUNT OF $39,753.00) | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF ORDER UNDER SEVEN DAY RULE & POS (7/7/16) TERESA M HENDRICKS (Attorney) on behalf of LEONARD AND MONROE LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | BENCH VERDICT - CIVIL - MOLLY NORTON, CER 8741 The following event: NON JURY TRIAL - CIVIL scheduled for 07/06/2016 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: BENCH VERDICT - CIVIL Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11A HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 11A Certificate #: | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST AND FINAL DAY OF CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL (OPINION OF FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND VERDICT WILL BE ISSUED) | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEF FILED (HEARING ON DAMAGES TO BE CONDUCTED ON 7/6/16 @ 9:00) | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | HELD - MOLLY NORTON, CER 8741 The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 05/04/2016 at 4:00 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: HELD Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11A HELD ON THE RECORD COURT REPORTER: FTR 11A Certificate #: | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW BRION B DOYLE (Attorney) on behalf of SPLURGE SALON AND SPA LLC (DEFENDANT) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS The following event: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 04/20/2016 at 3:30 pm has been resulted as follows: Result: ADJOURNED DUE TO OTHER REASONS Judge: YATES, HONORABLE CHRISTOPHER P Location: 17TH CIRCUIT COURT- COURTROOM #11A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.