Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Civil case against Ellison, Jefferey, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, MI, . Kent County, MI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2013 |
CategoryGeneral Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 686158 Date: 03/25/2014 | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROGRESS AND POS | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR NO PROGRESS & POS | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED (09/29/13) JEFFEREY ELLISON (DEFENDANT); | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | SECOND SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFEREY ELLISON (DEFENDANT); | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SECOND SUMMONS AND ORDER (TO EXPIRE 12/24/13) | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FEE PAID Receipt: 648282 Date: 09/24/2013 | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFEREY ELLISON (DEFENDANT); | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | FILING FEES FOR NEW CASE Receipt: 633619 Date: 07/15/2013 | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT(3)EXHIBITS(3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.