Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) case against Michael Wallace, in the jurisdiction of Ingham County, MI, . Ingham County, MI Superior Courts with CLINTON CANADY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationIngham County, MI |
|
Case Outcome TypeUndisposed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING HELD ON THE RECORD THE FOLLOWING EVENT: CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2024 AT 1:45 PM HAS BEEN RESULTED AS FOLLOWS: RESULT: HEARING HELD ON THE RECORD JUDGE: CANADY III, CLINTON LOCATION: CIRCUIT COURT ANNEX RESULT0001 | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING IN OPEN COURT- JURY TRIAL- MARCH 27, 2024 | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL DATE: 03/27/2024 TIME: 8:30 AM JUDGE: CANADY III, CLINTON LOCATION: CIRCUIT COURT ANNEX | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: EVENT: CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE: 01/08/2024 TIME: 1:45 PM JUDGE: CANADY III, CLINTON LOCATION: CIRCUIT COURT ANNEX RESULT: HEARING HELD ON THE RECORD | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: EVENT: CRIMINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE: 01/08/2024 TIME: 1:45 PM JUDGE: CANADY III, CLINTON LOCATION: CIRCUIT COURT ANNEX | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PURSUANT TO MCR 8.110(C)(3)(G), CASE REASSIGNED TO HON. CLINTON CANADY THE JUDGE WAS CHANGED FROM AQUILINA, ROSEMARIE E. TO CANADY III, CLINTON | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING ADJOURNED THE FOLLOWING EVENT: JURY TRIAL CRIMINAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/03/2023 AT 9:00 AM HAS BEEN RESULTED AS FOLLOWS: RESULT: C30 ADJOURNED JUDGE: AQUILINA, ROSEMARIE E. LOCATION: COURTROOM 5 - VETERANS MEMORIAL RESULT STAFF: STA0001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.