Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Ingham County, MI, . Ingham County, MI Superior Courts with James R. Giddings presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Giddings Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationIngham County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CLERKS NOTICE (CIVIL) CLERKS' NOTICE SENT ON: 10/05/2010 08:31:33 | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED C30 | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PLT W/PS 093010 VIA FIRST CLASS MAIL | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED ATTORNEY: LEPINE, JESSICA E. (46171) RECEIPT: 257324 DATE: 09/20/2010 | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.