Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos, Gabriela, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Killian, Clinton O'Keefe, against Hushman, Harley P., Kushman, Dolores, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Gabriela Ramos vs. Dolores Kushman et al ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: May 28 2015 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Report 229220-Report Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REPORT [229220] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Add'l Description: Lis Pendens Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : LIS PENDENS Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet 212350-Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET [212350] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.