Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maldonado, Maria, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Booska, Steven Alfred, against Stawartz, Samantha, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time321 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins., et al. vs. Samantha Stawartz Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21195 Stone Rodney Judge: Stone, Rodney |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 25 2015 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins., et al. vs. Samantha Stawartz Motion OSC Details: 211200 - Dismiss ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins., et al. vs. Samantha Stawartz ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause 214220-Order: Show Cause Motion/OSC Detail: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court ORDER: SHOW CAUSE [214220] Motion: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [211201] Additional Description : Filed By COURT [924110] |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference 231110-Statement: Case Man Conference Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff STATEMENT: CASE MAN CONFERENCE [231110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins., et al. vs. Samantha Stawartz Motion OSC Details: 221730 - Failure to File Default ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.