Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Griffin, Elisa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Salgado, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Maria Mihm presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Elisa Griffin vs. Juan Salgado Motion OSC Details: 911200 - Dismiss ; Judge: J21465 Ortiz Elia Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Apr 29 2015 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Add'l Description: Respondent Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: Additional Description : RESPONDENT Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Elisa Griffin vs. Juan Salgado ; Judge: J21465 Ortiz Elia Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.