Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coyle, Michael Brian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Coyle, Ericka, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with M. Donovan Scales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 933910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DISMISSAL [933910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Coyle, M. vs. Coyle, E. ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion; Coyle, M. vs. Coyle, E. Motion OSC Details: 921210 - Child Support ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : Health Care, Other Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Sep 28 2009 Type: 943410 - Dismissal: Other Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 933910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DISMISSAL [933910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 937710-Orientation - Petitioner; Coyle, M. vs. Coyle, E. ; Judge: FL0004 Scales Donovan Judge: Scales, Donovan |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion 912710-Motion Motion/OSC Detail: 921210 - Child Support Add'l Description: Health Care, Other Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service MOTION [912710] Motion: CHILD SUPPORT [921210] Additional Description : HEALTH CARE, OTHER Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.