Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bronwell, Laura E., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Sauer, Hon. Nan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for late and Limited Formal Testacy and/or Appointment
Date: August 17, 2022Devisees
Date: August 17, 2022Will
Date: August 17, 2022Bond without Sureties
Date: August 17, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 17, 2022Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 17, 2022Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/28/2022, by Hon. Nan Sauer
Date: October 11, 2022Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: September 21, 2022Proposed Order/Decree
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree and Order on Pettion for Late and Limited Formal Testacy and/or Appointment of Laura E. Brownwell as Personal Representative on 9/28/22 by Assistant Register | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/28/2022, by Hon. Nan Sauer | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 10/11/2022 12:57:23 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Worcester Telegram and Gazette. | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for late and Limited Formal Testacy and/or Appointment | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Devisees | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Will | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Bond without Sureties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.