Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tripi, Robert C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Sauer, Hon. Nan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate
Date: August 17, 2022Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 17, 2022Will
Date: August 17, 2022Bond without Sureties
Date: August 17, 2022Devisees
Date: August 17, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 17, 2022Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: September 20, 2022Motion To Probate Will with Interlineations ALLOWED on 12/15/2022 File Reference # 18
Date: December 21, 2022Motion To Probate Will with Interlineations
Date: December 06, 2022Affidavit Of Petitioner
Date: December 21, 2022Decree Dated 12-15-2022 and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Sauer, Hon. Nan
Date: December 21, 2022Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 12/15/2022, by Hon. Nan Sauer
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Probate Will with Interlineations ALLOWED on 12/15/2022 File Reference # 18 | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Petitioner | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Decree Dated 12-15-2022 and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Sauer, Hon. Nan
Judge: Sauer, Nan |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 12/15/2022, by Hon. Nan Sauer | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 12/21/2022 15:25:21 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Probate Will with Interlineations | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Worcester Telegram and Gazette. | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.