Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mckenzie, Paulette, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate *Dismissed January 23, 2023*
Date: August 17, 2022Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Will
Date: August 17, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 17, 2022Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 17, 2022Affidavit In Support o Lost Will
Date: August 17, 2022Devisees
Date: August 17, 2022Motion For Appointment of Special Personal Representative
Date: August 17, 2022Affidavit Of Petitioner
Date: August 17, 2022Temporary Bond Without Sureties Filed *Special*
Date: August 17, 2022Motion For Appointment Special Personal Representative ALLOWED on 08/30/2022 File Reference # 9
Date: September 19, 2022Motion To Vacate Special Personal Representative ALLOWED on 09/14/2022 File Reference # 27
Date: September 19, 2022Judgment of Dismissal Dated 1-23-2023 on Petition for Formal Judge: Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M.
Date: January 24, 2023Appearance and Objection
Date: September 13, 2022Emergency Verified Motion To Vacate Special Personal Representative
Date: September 13, 2022Appearance by Attorney, Katherine A Bagdis, Esq.,Party Name Robert LaPierre Objection
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dismissal Dated 1-23-2023 on Petition for Formal Judge: Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M. | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Appointment Special Personal Representative ALLOWED on 08/30/2022 File Reference # 9 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Vacate Special Personal Representative ALLOWED on 09/14/2022 File Reference # 27 | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance by Attorney, Katherine A Bagdis, Esq.,Party Name Robert LaPierre Objection | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance and Objection | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Emergency Verified Motion To Vacate Special Personal Representative | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Dated 8-30-2022 Appointing Paulette McKenzie Special Personal Representative *Vacated on September 15, 2022 Judge Bailey* Judge: Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M. | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Approved of Special Representative dated 08/30/2022, by Hon. Kathryn M. Bailey *Special* | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Special Pers. Rep. Sent On: 08/31/2022 12:36:54 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Stefan Lapierre Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to Formal Probate, , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.