Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Califano, Jr., Gregory R., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Bailey, Hon. Kathryn M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2022 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Proposed Order/Decree
Date: August 16, 2022Closing Statement 08/03/2023
Date: August 04, 2023Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 16, 2022Will
Date: August 16, 2022Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 10/27/2022, by Hon. Kathryn M. Bailey
Date: November 02, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 16, 2022Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: August 16, 2022Bond without Sureties
Date: August 16, 2022Devisees
Date: August 16, 2022Petition for Informal Probate
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Elizabeth I Califano Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Other Pleading, , | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Closing Statement 08/03/2023 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Gregory R. Califano, Jr. as Personal Representative on 10/27/22 by Assistant Register | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 10/27/2022, by Hon. Kathryn M. Bailey | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 11/02/2022 08:31:19 | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Elizabeth I. Califano Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, , | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Will | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.