Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Freel, Amanda B., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with German, Hon. Geoffrey R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Proposed Order/Decree
Date: August 15, 2022Inventory Filed on 10/21/22
Date: October 24, 2022Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: September 21, 2022Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by
Date: August 15, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 15, 2022Devisees
Date: August 15, 2022Affidavit In Support of Lost Will
Date: August 15, 2022Bond without Sureties
Date: August 15, 2022Will (copy)
Date: August 15, 2022Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 15, 2022Petition for Formal Probate
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed on 10/21/22 | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/27/2022, by Hon. Geoffrey R German | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate Appointing Amanda B. Freel as Personal Representative on 9/27/22 by Assistant Register | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 10/04/2022 09:05:39 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Clinton Item. | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Devisees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.