Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Evans, Elizabeth K, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts Worcester County Probate and Family Court with Keamy, Hon. Leilah A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeamy, Hon. Leilah A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseWorcester County Probate and Family Court |
Devisees
Date: September 01, 2021Petition for Formal Probate
Date: September 01, 2021Will dated January 8, 2010 9 pages
Date: September 01, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: September 01, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: September 01, 2021Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: October 13, 2021Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 10/14/2021, by Hon. Leilah A Keamy
Date: October 19, 2021Decree Dated 10-14-2021 and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Keamy, Hon. Leilah A
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 10/14/2021, by Hon. Leilah A Keamy | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Dated 10-14-2021 and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Keamy, Hon. Leilah A | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 10/19/2021 13:34:30 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Devisees | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Will dated January 8, 2010 9 pages | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.