Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brown, Louis M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against City Of Leominster, John Does 1 Through 10, Massachusetts Interlocal Insurance Association, Mazzarella, Dean, represented by Maravelis, Esq., Arthur Evan, Quinn, Esq., Wendy L, Shipley, Esq., Sarah Anne, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Karen L. Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Amended: FIRST amended complaint filed by Louis M Brown and Jury Claim [E-FILED]
Date: December 05, 2023Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A [E-FILED]
Date: January 03, 2024Defendants City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Notice of Filing Rule 9A Package [E-FILED]
Date: January 03, 2024Complaint electronically filed.
Date: April 11, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A [E-FILED] | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Memorandum in support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss [E-FILED] | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Submission of Document Listing Per Superior Court Rule 9A [E-FILED] | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Notice of Filing Rule 9A Package [E-FILED] | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Motion to dismiss certain counts (Renewed Motion to Dismiss) [E-FILED] | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant City of Leominster, Dean Mazzarella's Notice of service of renewed motion to dismiss (E-FILED) | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended: FIRST amended complaint filed by Louis M Brown and Jury Claim [E-FILED] | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Dismiss (#7.0): ALLOWED See order dated 11/6/23. Notices mailed 11/9/23 Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER: ON CITY OF LEOMINSTER AND MAYOR DEAN MAZZARELLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS- Accordingly, the court ALLOWS the motion to dismiss with leave for the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of this order if he is able to cure these deficiencies. Copies mailed 11/9/23 Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 08/31/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: FTR - rm 25 Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.