Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Halilaj, Vera, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ellis, Esq., Dennis John, against Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc., Am-Pm Cleaning Services Inc., Gdi Services Inc., Lusignan Security Agency Inc., Worcester Tc Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Bright, Esq., David James, Hassett, Esq., David F, Letts, Esq., Eileen M, Quinn, Esq., Wendy L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with William J. Ritter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 19, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 19, 2022Amended: SECOND amended complaint filed by Vera Halilaj - CJ
Date: December 05, 2022Answer to amended complaint (E-FILED) Applies To: Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc. (Defendant)
Date: December 14, 2022Defendant Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc.'s Notice of Filing (E-FILED)
Date: December 14, 2022Plaintiff Vera Halilaj's Motion to amend the Complaint (E-FILED)
Date: September 13, 2022Plaintiff Vera Halilaj's Motion to Amend the Complaint
Date: February 21, 2023Plaintiff Vera Halilaj's Motion to Amend the Complaint (E-FILED)
Date: December 02, 2022Amended: original complaint filed by Vera Halilaj - CJ
Date: September 19, 2022Answer to SECOND Amended Complaint Applies To: Worcester TC LLC (Defendant)
Date: May 15, 2023Plaintiff Vera Halilaj's Statement of No Opposition
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend the Tracking Order (#21.0): ALLOWED Tracking order amended. Notices mailed 7/17/23 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Vera Halilaj's Assented to Motion to extend the tracking order (E-FILED) | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED Agent Person in Charge - 4/28/23 Applies To: Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc. (Defendant) | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant GDI Services, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [E-FILED] | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Letts, Esq., Eileen M (Attorney) on behalf of Worcester TC LLC (Defendant) | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to SECOND Amended Complaint Applies To: Worcester TC LLC (Defendant) | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Eileen M Letts, Esq. added for Defendant Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc. | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant GDI Services Inc. Formerly known as AM-PM Cleaning Services Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Admit Eileen M Letts Pro Hac Vice (#16.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 4/28/23 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Abbvie Bioresearch Center Inc.'s Motion to admit Eileen M. Letts Pro Hac Vice (E-FILED) Applies To: Letts, Eileen M. (Other interested party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.