Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fedyukhin, Vasiliy, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Wickstrom, Esq., Timothy P, against Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M., represented by Gil, Esq., Lindsey, Holtslag, Esq., Tamara Smith, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: November 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs, waiving all rights of appeal and or rights to petition for attorneys' fees and/or expenses (E-FILED) NOTICES MAILED 4/13/23 Applies To: Wickstrom, Esq., Timothy P (Attorney) on behalf of Fedyukhin, Vasiliy (Plaintiff); Gil, Esq., Lindsey (Attorney) on behalf of Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant) | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 1st Answer filed in Medical Malpractice case to original complaint with claim for trial by jury (E-FILED) | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Company (E-FILED) Applies To: Holtslag, Esq., Tamara Smith (Attorney) on behalf of Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant); Wickstrom, Esq., Timothy P (Attorney) on behalf of Fedyukhin, Vasiliy (Plaintiff) | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (E-FILED) Applies To: Fedyukhin, Vasiliy (Plaintiff); Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant) | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Holtslag, Esq., Tamara Smith (Attorney) on behalf of Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant) | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint [E-FILED] Applies To: Holtslag, Esq., Tamara Smith (Attorney) on behalf of Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant); Wickstrom, Esq., Timothy P (Attorney) on behalf of Fedyukhin, Vasiliy (Plaintiff) | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED at last and usual; Service already made Applies To: Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M. (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Levenson, D.D.S, Stanley M.: Service through person in charge / agent; Service made on 10/28/22. | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.