Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Wallace, Esq., Krista Lynn, against Rosario, Manuel A., Three Thousand Two Hundred Eighty One Dollars, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with William J. Ritter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Notice of Rule 74 Hearing (E-FILED)
Date: October 11, 2022Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment
Date: November 07, 2022Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Notice of Rule 74 hearing (E-FILED)
Date: November 08, 2022Affidavit of Military Service (E-FILED)
Date: November 04, 2022Entered as to: Defendant Rosario, Manuel A.: Defaulted by 55(a) request;
Date: November 07, 2022Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Request for Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) (E-FILED)
Date: November 04, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: August 15, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed. [E-FILED]
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that Three Thousand Two Hundred Eighty One Dollars (($3, 281.00) IN U.s. Currency be forfeited to Commonwealth Of Massachusetts. Entered and Copies mailed 12/5/22 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#9.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 12/5/22 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 12/01/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR19 Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Eric Thuotte, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Jorge Villali, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Notice of Rule 74 hearing (E-FILED) | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Rosario, Manuel A.: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/07/2022 11:50:08 | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Request for Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) (E-FILED) Applies To: Wallace, Esq., Krista Lynn (Attorney) on behalf of Commonwealth Of Massachusetts (Plaintiff) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service (E-FILED) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Request for Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) (E-FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.