Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rouisse, As Trustee Of The Donna M. Rouisse Trust, Donna A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Berlinsky, Esq., Joshua, Hemsey, Esq., Christopher Farid, Howayeck, Esq., Andrew G, against Fitchburg Soccer, Llc, Fitchburg Soccer Llc, represented by Davis, Esq., Brent Scott, Kelleher, Esq., John F, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 22, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 12/13/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Eric Thuotte, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Jorge Villali, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal to the dismissal of all claims which have been brought or could have been brought in this action by any Party with prejudice, all rights of appeal being waived, and each side to bear their own attorneys' fees and without costs. (E-FILED) Applies To: Hemsey, Esq., Christopher Farid (Attorney) on behalf of Rouisse, As Trustee Of The Donna M. Rouisse Trust, Donna A. (Plaintiff); Kelleher, Esq., John F (Attorney) on behalf of Fitchburg Soccer LLC (Defendant) | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Financial Note: Should have been applied to one summons not split | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/14/2022 14:54:26 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 11/15/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Eric Thuotte, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Jorge Villali, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 11/15/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Eric Thuotte, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Jorge Villali, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue All Hearings Scheduled for November 15, 2022 (#13.0): ALLOWED If matter is not resolved, all parties shall attend a status conference on December 13, 2022 at 2pm. Notices mailed 11/14/22 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Donna A. Rouisse, As Trustee Of The Donna M. Rouisse Trust's Joint Motion to continue all hearings scheduled for Novermber 15, 2022 (E-FILED) | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/13/2022 08:49:43 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 09/15/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding
Judge: Ritter, William J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.