Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
D'Auteuil, Marie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Linch, Esq., Robert A, against Massachusetts Electric Company, represented by Bosse, Esq., Peter L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Ricciardone, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 16, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 16, 2021Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: January 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal and stipulate and agree that all claims by Marie D'Auteuil, be dismissed with prejudice, without costs, and with no right of appeal. (E-FILED) Applies To: D'auteuil, Marie (Plaintiff); Massachusetts Electric Company Doing Business as National Grid (Defendant) | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal (LIMITED) JOINT as to Claims of Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company A/S/O 13 Hope Avenue Junction, LLC Against Massachusetts Electric Company d/b/a National Grid ONLY, with prejudice, without costs, and with no right of appeal. (E-FILED) [PERTAINS TO CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. 2185CV00959A] Applies To: Massachusetts Electric Company Doing Business as National Grid (Defendant); Scottsdale Insurance Company Subrogee of 13 Hope Avenue Junction, LLC (Other interested party) | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue pretrial conference (#9.0): ALLOWED Notice Sent 3/28/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/11/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 03/27/2023 09:53:22 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Party / Case Participant Scottsdale Insurance Company Subrogee of 13 Hope Avenue Junction, LLC's Assented to Motion to continue pretrial conference (E-FILED) | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Clough-Segall, Esq., Sarah L (Attorney) on behalf of Massachusetts Electric Company Doing Business as National Grid (Defendant) | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Marie D'auteuil's Joint Motion to Extend Tracking Deadlines (E-FILED) | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadlines (#8.0): ALLOWED e-document sent 05/20/2022. Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/17/2022 11:21:49 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.