Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, against $783.00 In United States Currency, Baez-Hernandez, Fabio, represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 20, 2021Service Returned for Fabio Baez-Hernandez; Service made on 07/23/21 (E-FILED)
Date: July 30, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: July 20, 2021Affidavit of Military service.
Date: August 17, 2021Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment
Date: August 24, 2021Entered as to: Defendant Baez-Hernandez, Fabio: Defaulted by 55(a) request;
Date: August 24, 2021Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Request for Default
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that $783.00 IN United States Currency be forfeited to Commonwealth Of Massachusetts. Entered and Copies mailed 9/10/21 Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#6.0): ALLOWED Facts found as pled here. Notices mailed 9/10/21 Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Baez-Hernandez, Fabio: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military service. | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts in support of Request for default. | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Request for Default | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Fabio Baez-Hernandez; Service made on 07/23/21 (E-FILED) | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.