Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amos Financial Llc, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Perl, Esq., Joseph, against Perkins, Daniel R., Perkins, Mary J., represented by Kozlowski, Esq., Olivier E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Summary Judgment (#9.0): DENIED Material issues of fact exist regarding the validitity of the discharge of mortgage with the Worcester County Registry of Deeds so as to preclude the entry of summary judgment. Notices mailed 5/20/22 Judge: Manitsas, Hon. James M | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (E-FILED) Applies To: Amos Financial LLC (Plaintiff) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C (E-FILED) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition to p#9: Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel R. Perkins, Mary J. Perkins (E-FILED) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Amos Financial LLC's Statement of material facts (E-FILED) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Amos Financial LLC's Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (E-FILED) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Amos Financial LLC's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (E-FILED) | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal of counterclaim, with prejudice. (E-FILED) Applies To: Amos Financial LLC (Plaintiff); Perkins, Daniel R. (Defendant); Perkins, Mary J. (Defendant) | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Amos Financial LLC's Notice of withdrawal of motion to dismiss counterclaim. (E-FILED) | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | 9A Affidavit (E-FILED) Applies To: Amos Financial LLC (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.