Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kemp, Dorothy, Kemp, Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martin, Esq., John T, Nolte, Esq., Timothy A, Wood, Esq., Thomas G, against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Hot Springs Enterprises, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Bopp, Esq., Edward Alvin, Conte, Esq., Daniel Robert, Grossbaum, Esq., David A, Minich, Esq., Bethany Pierson, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue final pre-trial conference (#17.0): ALLOWED Notices Sent 8/15/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Defendants Douglas Kemp, Dorothy Kemp, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Hot Springs Enterprises, Inc. Doing Business as Stanley Steamer's Joint Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order (#18.0): ALLOWED Notice Sent 3/8/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Douglas Kemp, Dorothy Kemp's Joint Motion to extend tracking order (E-FILED) | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order (#15.0): ALLOWED Notice Sent 12/30/22 Judge: Yarashus, Hon. Valerie A | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Douglas Kemp's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) [E-FILED] Applies To: Kemp, Douglas (Plaintiff); Kemp, Dorothy (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Hot Springs Enterprises, Inc. Doing Business as Stanley Steamer (Defendant); Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Defendant) | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas G Wood, Esq. added for Plaintiff Dorothy Kemp | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas G Wood, Esq. added for Plaintiff Douglas Kemp | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order (#14.0): ALLOWED e-document sent 06/30/2022. Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.