Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
D'Ambra, D'Ambra, Lisa, D'Ambra, Sr., Vincent, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rose, Esq., Kelsey R, against Dp23 Bulldogs, Llc., Dp23 Bulldogs Llc.,, Plourde, Daniel, represented by D'Auria, Esq., Robert H, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Karen L. Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren L. Goodwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs Vincent D'Ambra, Sr., DP23 Bulldogs LLC.,'s Joint Motion to Extend Tracking Order (E-FILED) Applies To: D'Ambra, Sr., Vincent (Plaintiff); Lisa D'Ambra Individually and as Mother and Next Friend of Of minor children Morgan D'Ambra,Charlotte D'Ambra,Lucy D'Ambra and Vincent D'Ambra Jr. (Plaintiff); D'Ambra, Lisa (Plaintiff); DP23 Bulldogs LLC., (Defendant); Plourde, Daniel (Defendant) | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Continue the Final Pre Trial Conference (#7.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 9/26/23 Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/26/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Vincent D'Ambra, Sr., Lisa D'Ambra Individually and as Mother and Next Friend of Of minor children Morgan D'Ambra,Charlotte D'Ambra,Lucy D'Ambra and Vincent D'Ambra Jr., DP23 Bulldogs LLC.,, Daniel Plourde's Joint Motion to continue09/26/2023 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference (E-FILED) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Tracking Order (#6.0): ALLOWED Tracking order amended. Notices mailed 9/13/22 Judge: Manitsas, Hon. James M | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants DP23 Bulldogs LLC.,, Daniel Plourde's Motion to Exceed Tracking Order (E-FILED) | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert H D'Auria, Esq. added for Defendant Daniel Plourde | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph Edward Mizhir, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Daniel Plourde | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert H D'Auria, Esq. added for Defendant DP23 Bulldogs LLC., | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph Edward Mizhir, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant DP23 Bulldogs LLC., |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.