Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Silverback Construction, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ahmed, Esq., Mansooruddin, Mcnamara, Esq., John J, Nowicki, Esq., Karen L, against Cna Surety Corporation, Enfield Builders, Inc., J.G.Maclellan Concrete Co., Inc., Western Surety Company, represented by Cohn, Esq., Joshua, Hall, Esq., Edwin Latham, Hedberg, Esq., Frederick E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: December 31, 2020Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 31, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order deadlines (#28.0): ALLOWED as extending filing Rule 56 motions until 09/29/2023 e-document sent 09/12/2023. | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Silverback Construction, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Extend Tracking Order Deadlines [E-FILED] Applies To: Silverback Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff); Enfield Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); J.G.MaClellan Concrete Co., Inc. (Defendant) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order deadlines (#27.0): ALLOWED Notices Sent 8/4/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Silverback Construction, Inc.'s Motion to extend tracking order deadlines | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to stay proceedings and amend the tracking order (#25.0): Other action taken After reviewing all of the submissions, the pleadings and dockets of the related cases, the motion to stay is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. While there are appropriate reasons to stay any trial on the merits pending resolution of EBI-DCAMM matter in Suffolk, the discovery and summary judgments should proceed as per the present schedule. Notices Sent 7/12/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to advance for speedy trial (#24.0): No Action Taken After review of the pleadings, the relevant law and following a hearing, the court makes no ruling on Plaintiff's motion based on its ruling to stay these proceedings. See endorsement on paper #25 Notices Sent 7/12/23 Judge: Kenton-Walker, Hon. Janet
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 07/06/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue hearing (scheduled for 07/13/2023) (#26.0): ALLOWED e-document sent 06/13/2023 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 07/13/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Silverback Construction, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Continue Hearing [E-FILED] Applies To: Silverback Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff); Enfield Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); J.G.MaClellan Concrete Co., Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.