Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Umass Memorial Medical Center, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Benoit, Esq., Angela, Dru, Esq., Katherine M, Schumacher, Esq., David S, against Does 1-50; Inclusive, Total Health Plan, Inc., Tufts Associated Health Maintenence Organization, Inc., Tufts Health Plan Inc., represented by Kasten, Esq., Steven W, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Susan E. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan E. Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Amended: amended complaint filed by Umass Memorial Medical Center, Inc. (E-FILED)
Date: January 12, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 31, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice and without costs (E-FILED) NOTICES MAILED 11/3/21 Applies To: Benoit, Esq., Angela (Attorney) on behalf of Umass Memorial Medical Center, Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to admit Devin M. Senelick Pro Hac Vice (#9.0): ALLOWED notices mailed 04/20/2021 | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Umass Memorial Medical Center, Inc.'s Assented to Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Steven W Kasten, Esq. added for Defendant Total Health Plan, Inc. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Steven W Kasten, Esq. added for Defendant Tufts Associated Health Maintenence Organization, Inc. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Steven W Kasten, Esq. added for Defendant Tufts Health Plan Inc. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to amended complaint (e-FILED) Applies To: Tufts Health Plan Inc. (Defendant); Tufts Associated Health Maintenence Organization, Inc. (Defendant); Total Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant) | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Katherine M Dru, Esq. added for Plaintiff Umass Memorial Medical Center, Inc. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to admit Katherine M. Dru PRO HAC VICE (#4.0): ALLOWED notices mailed 01/26/2021 Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E
Judge: Susan ESullivan |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Tufts Associated Health Maintenence Organization, Inc.: Service accepted by counsel on 1/19/21; acceptance of service filed by Attorney Steven W. Kasten of Looney, Cohen & Aisenberg, LLP. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.