Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Hautanen, Esq., Sandra L, against 2013 Nissan Cube Suv Vin Jn8Az2Kr3Dt300500, Carrasco-Reyes, Miguel Angel, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Entered as to: Defendant Carrasco-Reyes, Miguel Angel: Defaulted by 55(a) request;
Date: September 09, 2020Affidavit that Miguel Angel Carrasco-Reyes is NOT in the Military (E-FILED)
Date: September 09, 2020Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion to Amend Judgment (E-FILED)
Date: January 28, 2021Affidavit in Support of Request for Default (E-FILED)
Date: September 09, 2020Service Returned for
Date: August 21, 2020Complaint electronically filed.-CJ
Date: July 31, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that 2013 Nissan Cube Suv VIN JN8AZ2KR3DT300500 be forfeited to Commonwealth Of Massachusetts. AMENDED Entered and Copies mailed 2/4/21 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Amend Judgment (#8.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 2/4/21 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion to Amend Judgment (E-FILED) | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that 2013 Nissan Cube Suv VIN JN8AZ2KR3DT300500 be forfeited to Commonwealth Of Massachusetts. Entered and Copies mailed 9/21/2020 Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion of Default Judgment (#6.0): ALLOWED Facts found as pled here. Notices mailed 9/21/2020 Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment Applies To: Carrasco-Reyes, Miguel Angel (Defendant) | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Carrasco-Reyes, Miguel Angel: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Miguel Angel Carrasco-Reyes is NOT in the Military (E-FILED) | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Request for Default (E-FILED) | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth Of Massachusetts's Request for Default (E-FILED) Applies To: Carrasco-Reyes, Miguel Angel (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.