We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Lomuscio Trucking, Llc Vs. Doherty, Robert Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Lomuscio Trucking, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leino, Esq., A. Eli, against Doherty, Lynne M, Doherty, Robert, represented by Katz, Esq., David S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Valerie A. Yarashus presiding.

Case Details for Lomuscio Trucking, Llc v. Doherty, Lynne M , et al.

Judge

Valerie A. Yarashus Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

January 30, 2019

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Last Refreshed

December 10, 2023

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Worcester County, MA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Lomuscio Trucking, Llc v. Doherty, Lynne M , et al.

Plaintiffs

Lomuscio Trucking, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Leino, Esq., A. Eli

Defendants

Doherty, Lynne M

Doherty, Robert

Attorneys for Defendants

Katz, Esq., David S

Case Events for Lomuscio Trucking, Llc v. Doherty, Lynne M , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/03/2021 11:30 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding
Docket Event Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, Without Costs and each party bearing their own attorney's fees. All parties waive their right to appeal (E-FILED) Applies To: Lomuscio Trucking, LLC (Plaintiff); Doherty, Robert (Defendant); Doherty, Lynne M (Defendant)
Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/03/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 05/18/2021 12:17:48 Notice Sent To: A. Eli Leino, Esq. Primmer Piper Eggleston and Cramer PC 900 Elm St 19th Floor, Manchester, NH 03105 Notice Sent To: David S Katz, Esq. Katz Law Group, P.C. 5 Frances Drive, Westboro, MA 01581
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/30/2020 14:04:15 Notice Sent To: A. Eli Leino, Esq. Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas, LLP 288 Main St, Milford, MA 01757 Notice Sent To: David S Katz, Esq. Katz Law Group, P.C. 5 Frances Drive, Westboro, MA 01581
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/30/2020 14:04:05 Notice Sent To: A. Eli Leino, Esq. Mayer, Antonellis, Jachowicz & Haranas, LLP 288 Main St, Milford, MA 01757 Notice Sent To: David S Katz, Esq. Katz Law Group, P.C. 5 Frances Drive, Westboro, MA 01581
Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 11/30/2020 12:30 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Courtroom 26 FTR Hon. Valerie A Yarashus, Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk

Judge: Yarashus, Valerie A

Docket Event General correspondence regarding KATZ Law Group, P.C.'s Change of Address
Docket Event Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: David S Katz, Esq.
Docket Event Affidavit of David S. Katz
See all events