Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, against $470.00 In U.S. Currency, O'Keefe, Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with William J. Ritter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2018 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Complaint filed pursuant to G. L. c. 94C, ยง47
Date: July 05, 2018Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment
Date: August 03, 2018Service Returned for Defendant O'Keefe, Curtis: Service via certified mail;
Date: July 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that $470.00 in U.S. Currency be forfeited to Commonwealth of Massachusetts. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: 1. That the Defendant $470.00 In US Currency, seized on January 13, 2018, is hereby forfeited as to the interested party, Curtis O'Keefe; 2. That of the Defendant, $470.00 in US Currency, the amount of $235.00 be forfeited to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts through the District Attorney's Office for the Middle District to be used for education, Investigation and prosecution of cases and the use thereof as provided for under G.L. c.94C, sec.47; 3. The balance in the amount of $235.00 be forfeited to the Worcester Police Department to be used for the same purposes as stated above. 4. This Judgment forfeits any and all interests that Curtis O'Keefe may have in the Defendant. Entered and Copies mailed 09/04/2018. Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#6.0): ALLOWED After hearing. notices mailed 09/04/2018. Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 08/30/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR Room 19 Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/07/2018 08:43:07 | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant O'Keefe, Curtis: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Curtis O'Keefe is not in the Military | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts in support of paper # 4 | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Glenn Allan Ludwig, Esq. Defendant: $470.00 in U.S. Currency | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: O'Keefe, Curtis (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.