Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Pasacane, Anna M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Desilets, Esq., Lawrence E, against Warner, Angeline E, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Susan E. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2018 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Received from Defendant Warner, Angeline E: Answer to original complaint; Jury Demand.
Date: September 12, 2018Defendant Angeline E Warner's Motion for Hospital Records.
Date: February 07, 2019Defendant Angeline E Warner's Motion for Hospital Records. -Certificate of Service.
Date: September 20, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Anna M Pasacane, Angeline E Warner's original complaint * notices mailed 02/11/2021 | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/16/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Susan E Sullivan, Presiding
Judge: Sullivan, Susan E |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 01/21/2021 12:28:20 Notice Sent To: Lawrence E Desilets, Esq. Lawrence E. Desilets, Attorney- At - Law 61 Nicholas Rd Suite B5, Framingham, MA 01701 Notice Sent To: Thomas B Farrey III 446 Main Street 22nd Floor, Worcester, MA 01608 | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 09/25/2020 12:12:25 Notice Sent To: Lawrence E Desilets, Esq. Lawrence E. Desilets, Attorney- At - Law 61 Nicholas Rd Suite B5, Framingham, MA 01701 Notice Sent To: Thomas B Farrey III 446 Main Street 22nd Floor, Worcester, MA 01608 | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 10/20/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Valerie A Yarashus, Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Yarashus, Valerie A |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court orders rescheduling due to State of Emergency surrounding the Covid-19 virus.: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/04/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled-Covid-19 emergency Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: James G Reardon, Jr. |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 06/30/2020 13:50:59 | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 04/16/2020 12:10:21 | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court orders rescheduling due to State of Emergency surrounding the Covid-19 virus.: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/07/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled-Covid-19 emergency Hon. Susan E Sullivan, Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Sullivan, Susan E |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/19/2020 11:26:23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.