Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Trustees Of The Green At Shrewsbury Condominium Trust Aka Brandywine Condominium Trust, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Brooks, Esq., Richard E, Lennon, Esq., Dean T, against Shankar, Lalitha, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeLiens |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Dean T Lennon, Esq.
Date: November 29, 2018Affidavit of Property Manager, Brian St. George
Date: November 19, 2018Affidavit of Dean T. Lennon, Esq.
Date: November 19, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 01/17/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Francis E Flannery, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Flannery, Francis E |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41 (a) (1) (I) Applies To: Trustees of the Green at Shrewsbury Condominium Trust aka Brandywine Condominium Trust (Plaintiff); Shankar, Lalitha (Defendant) | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Dean T Lennon, Esq. | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Dean T Lennon, Esq. added for Plaintiff Trustees of the Green at Shrewsbury Condominium Trust aka Brandywine Condominium Trust | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Property Manager, Brian St. George | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Lalitha Shankar is not in the Military | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Dean T. Lennon, Esq. | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Trustees of the Green at Shrewsbury Condominium Trust aka Brandywine Condominium Trust's Memorandum of assessment of damages | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Trustees of the Green at Shrewsbury Condominium Trust aka Brandywine Condominium Trust's Motion for Default Judgment and hearing on assessment of damages and issuance of notice to sell (pursuant to M.G.L. c. 254, sections 5 and 5A) | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding letter from defendant with bank statements received 10/22/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.