Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Allard, Eric, Bonneau, Matt, Dilboy, Rebecca, Merriam, Diane, Merriam, Lori, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Ashworth, Esq., David E, against Mccall, Daniel, West Brookfield Rescue Squad, Inc., represented by Cieslak, Esq., Cindy Miller, Hennigan, Jr., Esq., Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Received from Defendant McCall, Daniel: Answer to amended complaint; *see p#36
Date: March 25, 2019Opposition to to defendants motion to disqualify counsel filed by Diane Merriam(re #29)
Date: January 14, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Cindy M. Cieslak Applies To: McCall, Daniel (Defendant)
Date: January 07, 2019Defendant Daniel McCall's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 07, 2019Daniel McCall's Memorandum in support of Defendant's Daniel McCall's Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 07, 2018Defendant Daniel McCall's Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 07, 2018Defendant Daniel McCall's Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 24, 2018List of exhibits (Exhibits not scanned)
Date: October 15, 2018ORDER: INTERIM ORDER- (See Order) Copies mailed 8/27/18 Judge: Connolly, Hon. Rosemary
Date: August 24, 2018Amended: original complaint filed by Diane Merriam
Date: July 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without the award of costs and/or fees to any party, pursuant to a settlement agreement reached by the parties. Notices mailed 5/12/2020 Applies To: Merriam, Diane (Plaintiff); West Brookfield Rescue Squad, Inc. (Defendant); McCall, Daniel (Defendant) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 03/16/2020 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Judge: Daniel MWrenn |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: David E Ashworth, Esq. Attorney: Robert J Hennigan, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Cindy Miller Cieslak, Esq. | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/07/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/11/2020 11:31:23 | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Enlargement of Time Pertaining to Discovery and Modification of Scheduling Order (#37.0): ALLOWED Changed in header and tracking order sent : 05/23/2019 | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Diane Merriam, West Brookfield Rescue Squad, Inc.'s Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time Pertaining to Discovery and Modification of Scheduling Order | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant McCall, Daniel: Answer to amended complaint; *see p#36 | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant West Brookfield Rescue Squad, Inc.: Answer to amended complaint; | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (#35.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 3/11/19 Judge: Yarashus, Hon. Valerie A
Judge: Valerie AYarashus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.